EP0927745 - OPTICAL PLASTIC MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 9-11 Horidome-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0012 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states KUREHA KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 9-11 Horidome-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATONO, Hiroki 1-7, Ochiai Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima 974 / JP | 02 /
MACHIDA, Katsuichi 60-12, Toriinishi Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima 974 / JP | 03 /
SHOUJI, Masuhiro 3-6, Kubota Katakishi Nakoso-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima 979-01 / JP | 04 /
OGIHARA, Takeo 3-6, Nakamukae 2-chome Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima 974 / JP | 05 /
SAKAGAMI, Teruo 2-7, Nakamukae 3-chome Nishiki-machi Iwaki-shi Fukushima 974 / JP | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97933863.9 | 31.07.1997 | [1999/27] | WO1997JP02665 | Priority number, date | JP19960201707 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20170796 | [1999/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804621 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0927745 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/04, C08K5/20, G02B1/04, C08F220/10, // (C08F220/10, 220:52, 230:02) | [2000/48] | CPC: |
C08K3/16 (EP);
C08F20/10 (EP);
C08F220/52 (EP);
C08F230/02 (EP);
C08K3/24 (EP);
G02B1/04 (EP);
G02B5/22 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/16, C08L33/04 (EP);
C08K3/24, C08L33/04 (EP);
G02B1/04, C08L43/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/27] | C08L33/04, C08L33/24, C08L43/02, C08K5/20, C08K5/521, G02B1/04, G02B5/22, C08F20/10, C08F220/52, C08F230/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/27] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES KUNSTSTOFFMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1999/27] | English: | OPTICAL PLASTIC MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [1999/27] | French: | MATERIAU PLASTIQUE OPTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1999/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.1999 | Translation filed | 22.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.1999 | Search fee paid | 22.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 28.11.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/39] | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH08136727 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [P]JPH08201735 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [P]JPH09113701 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [P]JPH09188796 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) |