Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001502823 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US68020396 | 11.07.1996 | US9711883 | 10.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0912934 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2004 | B1 | EP0912934 | 06.05.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68020396 | 11.07.1996 | US9711883 | 10.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69727381T | 09.12.2004 | T2 | DE69727381D1 | 04.03.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US68020396 | 11.07.1996 | US9711883 | 10.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9802810 | Global Dossier | 22.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68020396 | 11.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007234047 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US68020396 | 11.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5860072 | 12.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US68020396 | 11.07.1996 |