blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978093

EP0978093 - CHIP CARD, PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CHIP CARD AND SEMICONDUCTOR CHIP FOR USE IN A CHIP CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2001/20]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HUBER, Michael
Peter-Rosegger-Strasse 17
D-93152 Nittendorf / DE
02 / STAMPKA, Peter
Klardorfer Strasse 41a
D-92421 Schwandorf / DE
03 / HOUDEAU, Detlef
Blumenstrasse 28
D-84085 Langquaid / DE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Zedlitz, Peter, et al
OSRAM GmbH
Intellectual Property IP
Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf., et al
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date97934421.514.07.1997
[2000/06]
WO1997DE01479
Priority number, dateDE199613211308.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19632113
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9807113
Date:19.02.1998
Language:DE
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978093
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978093
Date:17.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.1998
ClassificationIPC:G06K19/077
[2000/06]
CPC:
G06K19/07728 (EP,US); G06K19/077 (KR); G06K19/07743 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/06]
TitleGerman:CHIPKARTE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER CHIPKARTE UND HALBLEITERCHIP ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINER CHIPKARTE[2000/06]
English:CHIP CARD, PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING A CHIP CARD AND SEMICONDUCTOR CHIP FOR USE IN A CHIP CARD[2000/06]
French:CARTE A PUCE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CARTE A PUCE, ET PUCE DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR UTILISABLE DANS UNE CARTE A PUCE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase05.02.1999National basic fee paid 
05.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
19.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2001Fee for grant paid
09.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0207852  (BULL SA [FR]) [A] 1,8,15 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 26 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9208209  (JURISCH REINHARD [DE]) [A] 1,8,15* the whole document *;
 [A]FR2695234  (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1,8,15 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 11 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0716394  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8,15 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 36 * * figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.