EP0914193 - CATALYTIC INCINERATION PROCESS AND CATALYST COMPOSITION USEFUL THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN BRINK, Peter, John Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
HUISMAN, Hans, Michiel Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
VERMEULEN, Thomas, Stanley Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1999/19] | Application number, filing date | 97934531.1 | 22.07.1997 | [1999/19] | WO1997EP04011 | Priority number, date | EP19960202133 | 26.07.1996 Original published format: EP 96202133 | [1999/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804340 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914193 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914193 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/86, B01J27/16 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
B01D53/8612 (EP);
B01J27/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KATALYTISCHE VERBRENNUNG UND DAFÜR VERWENDBARE KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2000/39] | English: | CATALYTIC INCINERATION PROCESS AND CATALYST COMPOSITION USEFUL THEREFOR | [1999/19] | French: | PROCEDE D'INCINERATION CATALYTIQUE ET COMPOSITION DE CATALYSEUR UTILISABLE PREVU A CET EFFET | [1999/19] |
Former [1999/19] | VERFAHREN ZUR KATALYTISCHE VERBRENNUNG UND DAFÜR VERVENDBARE KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 06.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]GB1558656 (SHELL INT RESEARCH) [DY] 1-9 * page 2, line 5 - line 23; claim 1 *; | [YA]US4788171 (KLENDWORTH DOUGLAS D) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-4 * [A] 9,10; | [A]US4640908 (DUPIN THIERRY) [A] 1,3,5,8 * abstract * |