EP0922068 - USE OF CASHEW NUT HUSK OIL IN RUBBER AND DUROPLASTICS RECYCLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stielau, Martin Ernst Melides, Caveira 7570 Grândola / PT | [1999/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Pereira da Cruz, Joao J. Pereira da Cruz, S.A. Rua Vitor Cordon, 14 1249-103 Lisboa / PT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Pereira da Cruz, Joao Rua Vitor Cordon, 14 1200 Lisboa / PT | Application number, filing date | 97934807.5 | 19.08.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997PT00006 | Priority number, date | PT19960101907 | 20.08.1996 Original published format: PT 10190796 | PT19960101929 | 24.10.1996 Original published format: PT 10192996 | [1999/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9807777 | Date: | 26.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0922068 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/04, C08L21/00 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
C08J11/18 (EP);
C08L19/003 (EP);
C08J2321/00 (EP);
C08L93/00 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L19/003, C08L2666/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/24] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON CASHEWNUSSSCHALENÖL IM RECYCLING VON KAUTSCHUK UND WÄRMEHÄRTBAREN KUNSTSTOFFEN | [1999/24] | English: | USE OF CASHEW NUT HUSK OIL IN RUBBER AND DUROPLASTICS RECYCLING | [1999/24] | French: | L'UTILISATION DE L'HUILE DE COQUILLE DE NOIX DE CAJOU DANS LE DOMAINE DU RECYCLAGE DU CAOUTCHOUC ET DES PLASTIQUES THERMODURCISSABLES | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 30.11.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 01.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/34] | 21.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US1819416 (HARVEY MORTIMER T) [DX] 1-4 * page 2, line 21 - line 32 *; | [A] - N.D. GHATGE ET AL., "Reclaiming scrap rubber", RUBBER AGE, NEW YORK, (197307), vol. 105, no. 7, pages 35 - 38, XP002044758 [A] 1-4 * abstract * |