blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974057

EP0974057 - METHODS TO DETECT HK2 POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.07.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, DK
published on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
28.07.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.08.2006  [2006/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH
200 First Street S.W.
Rochester, MN 55905 / US
For all designated states
HYBRITECH, INC.
8958 Terman Court
San Diego, CA 92126-9006 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH
Mayo Clinic 200 First Street S.W.
Rochester, MN 55905 / US
For all designated states
HYBRITECH, INC.
8958 Terman Court
San Diego, CA 92126-9006 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAEDI, Mohammad Saeed
7898 Hendricks Drive
San Diego, CA 92126 / US
02 / MIKOLAJCZYK, Stephen, D.
4052 Conrad Avenue
San Diego, CA 92117 / US
03 / GRAUER, Lana
13686 Glencliff Way
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
04 / TINDALL, Donald, J.
2304 Telemark Lane
Rochester, MN 55901 / US
05 / YOUNG, Charles, Y., F.
5100 St. Mary Drive N.W.
Rochester, MN 55901 / US
06 / KLEE, George, G.
5949 - 11th Avenue S.W.
Rochester, MN 55902 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date97934958.615.07.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997US12322
Priority number, dateUS1996068086815.07.1996         Original published format: US 680868
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9802748
Date:22.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974057
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974057
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.01.1998
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/574, C07K16/40
[2000/04]
CPC:
C12N9/6445 (EP); C07K16/40 (EP); G01N33/57434 (EP);
G01N2333/96455 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION DER HK2 POLYPEPTIDE[2000/04]
English:METHODS TO DETECT HK2 POLYPEPTIDES[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE POLYPEPTIDES HK2[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase11.02.1999National basic fee paid 
11.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.01.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
04.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2005Fee for grant paid
23.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35]
Request for further processing for:16.01.2004Request for further processing filed
16.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199903   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
[2006/34]
Former [2006/33]BE21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/22]NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
Former [2006/15]GR21.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0228243  (EASTERN VIRGINIA MEDICAL AUTHO [US]) [X] 1-36 * claims 1,4,6-17 * * page 3, line 55 - line 63 *;
 [X]WO9503334  (MAYO FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-36 * claims 1-22 * * page 4, line 11 - line 17 * * page 5, line 3 - line 8 * * page 10, line 17 - page 14, line 12 * * example 2 *;
 [X]WO9530758  (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1-36 * claims 4-6 * * page 5, line 1 - line 8 * * page 15, line 12 - page 16, line 23 *;
 [PX]WO9634964  (HYBRITECH INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-36 * claims 18-28,32-34,36-51 * * page 4, line 10 - page 8, line 12 * * page 21, line 15 - page 22, line 27 * * examples 9,10 *;
 [PX]WO9701630  (ORION YHTYMAE OY [FI], et al) [PX] 1-36 * claims 18-20,23,36-39,41-43 * * page 6, line 8 - page 7, line 30 *;
 [X]  - SAEDI ET AL, "Overexpression of a human prostate specific glandular kallikrein, hK2, in E.coli and generation of antibodies", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (19950401), vol. 109, no. 2, pages 237 - 241, XP002015421 [X] 1-36 * page 238, column L, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0303-7207(95)03508-5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.