EP0959757 - INFANT/NEONATAL PULSE OXIMETER SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nellcor Puritan Bennett Incorporated 4280 Hacienda Drive Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | [1999/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANNHEIMER, Paul, D. 4119 Sugar Maple Drive Danville, CA 94506 / US | [1999/48] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97935031.1 | 21.07.1997 | [1999/48] | WO1997US12715 | Priority number, date | US19960695243 | 07.08.1996 Original published format: US 695243 | [1999/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805252 | Date: | 12.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959757 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959757 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/024 | [1999/48] | CPC: |
A61B5/02444 (EP,US);
A61B5/14552 (EP,US);
A61B5/6829 (EP,US);
A61B2503/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/48] | Title | German: | PULSE OXIMETERFÜHLER FÜR NEUGEBORENE | [1999/48] | English: | INFANT/NEONATAL PULSE OXIMETER SENSOR | [1999/48] | French: | SPHYGMO-OXYMETRE NEONATAL OU POUR NOURRISSONS | [2003/45] |
Former [1999/48] | SPHYGO-OXYMETRE NEONATAL OU POUR NOURRISSONS | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 10.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0572684 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12,18 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 51 * * column 7, line 50 - column 8, line 42 * * column 10, line 14 - line 31 * [A] 17,19,12,13,1,4-8; | [XY]EP0641543 (OHMEDA INC [US]) [X] 1,4,6,7,10,12,18 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 51 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 28 * * column 5, line 7 - line 46 * [Y] 9,11,19,2,3,8; | [A]DE4429845 (HEWLETT PACKARD GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4,6-8,10,12,18,19 * column 1, line 3 - line 26 * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 57 ** abstract *; | [YA]WO9615714 (AUSTEL LICENSING GMBH [AT], et al) [Y] 2,3,8,9,11,12,18,19 * page 1, line 17 - line 32 * * page 2, line 26 - line 31 * * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 11 * [A] 1,7,15 |