23.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
08.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] |
10.10.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
18.07.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
15.04.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
28.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] |
15.02.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] |
26.07.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] |
16.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.09.2001 |
First examination report |
|
05.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.04.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |
16.04.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |
08.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.09.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|