Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3696889B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2005 | B2 | JP2000500816 | 25.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | US9712948 | 30.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0918843 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2002 | B1 | EP0918843 | 02.06.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | US9712948 | 30.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE223962T | 15.09.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | US9712948 | 30.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9713167 | 01.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | US9712948 | 30.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2263748 | 24.09.2002 | C | CA2263748 | 19.02.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | US9712948 | 30.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69715428T | 07.08.2003 | T2 | DE69715428D1 | 17.10.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | US9712948 | 30.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9806816 | Global Dossier | 19.02.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR009078 | 08.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1120230C | 03.09.2003 | C | CN1232494 | 20.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2179357T | 16.01.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US2390296 | 14.08.1996 |