EP0918843 - PROCESS FOR MAKING HIGH DENSITY DETERGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAFFIRO, Paul, Anthony 6285 Delcrest Drive Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | 02 /
HALVORSEN, William, Garrett 1311 Dillon Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45208 / US | 03 /
CAPECI, Scott, William 3285 Citation Lane North Bend, OH 45052 / US | 04 /
WILLIAMS, Antonio 2011 Crest Road Cincinnati, OH 45240 / US | 05 /
DALTON, Larry, Vincent 8682 Hollyhock Drive Finneytown, OH 45231 / US | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97935094.9 | 30.07.1997 | [1999/22] | WO1997US12948 | Priority number, date | US19960023902P | 14.08.1996 Original published format: US 23902 P | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9806816 | Date: | 19.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0918843 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918843 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D11/00, C11D17/06 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
C11D11/0082 (EP);
C11D17/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASCHMITTELN MIT HOHER DICHTE | [1999/22] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING HIGH DENSITY DETERGENT | [1999/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN DETERGENT HAUTE DENSITE | [1999/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 10.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.2002 | BE | 11.09.2002 | CH | 11.09.2002 | FI | 11.09.2002 | GR | 11.09.2002 | LI | 11.09.2002 | DK | 11.12.2002 | SE | 11.12.2002 | PT | 17.12.2002 | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/21] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
FI | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
BE | 11.09.2002 | ||
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 11.09.2002 | |
CH | 11.09.2002 | ||
GR | 11.09.2002 | ||
LI | 11.09.2002 | ||
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
PT | 17.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 11.09.2002 | |
SE | 11.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | SE | 11.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0451894 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1,3,10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5133924 (APPEL PETER W [NL], et al) [DA] 1,3,7-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5160657 (BORTOLOTTI FABRIZIO [IT], et al) [DA] 1,3,7-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5516448 (CAPECI SCOTT W [US], et al) [DA] 1,3,6-10 * the whole document *; | [PA]US5554587 (CAPECI SCOTT W [US]) [PA] 1,3,6-10* the whole document * |