Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001502082 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US71655596 | 18.09.1996 | US9713142 | 24.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU714338B | Global Dossier | 23.12.1999 | B2 | AU3814697 | 14.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US71655596 | 18.09.1996 | US9713142 | 24.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1012706 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71655596 | 18.09.1996 | US9713142 | 24.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9711505 | 18.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US71655596 | 18.09.1996 | US9713142 | 24.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2265694 | 25.09.2001 | C | CA2265694 | 26.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71655596 | 18.09.1996 | US9713142 | 24.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ334674 | 29.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US71655596 | 18.09.1996 | US9713142 | 24.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9812630 | Global Dossier | 26.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71655596 | 18.09.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5835788 | 10.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US71655596 | 18.09.1996 |