EP1040280 - ELECTROMAGNETIC JOINT FORMING METHOD AND APPARATUS AND IMPROVED MOBILE UNIT FRAMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHMATICS, INC. 933 Meter Parkway Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Techmatics, Inc. 933 Meter Parkway Hauppauge, NY 11788 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENOIT, Robert, L. 49 Chatham Drive Oakdale, NY 11769 / US | 02 /
SPACHT, Glenn, L. 3 Broad Path Lloyd Neck, NY 11743 / US | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97935150.9 | 09.07.1997 | [2000/40] | WO1997US13211 | Priority number, date | US19960680532 | 09.07.1996 Original published format: US 680532 | [2000/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803797 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040280 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B4/00, F16B11/00, F16B17/00, B21D26/14 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B21D26/14 (EP,US);
B21D39/04 (EP,US);
B23P11/00 (EP,US);
B62K19/18 (EP,US);
F16B17/004 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49803 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49927 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/05] | F16B4/00, F16B11/00, F16B17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2000/40] | F16B4/00, F16B11/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/40] | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN, GERÄT HIERFÜR UND VERBESSERTE TRAGRAHMEN | [2000/40] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC JOINT FORMING METHOD AND APPARATUS AND IMPROVED MOBILE UNIT FRAMES | [2000/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE ELECTROMAGNETIQUES SERVANT A FABRIQUER DES JOINTS ET ELEMENTS DE CADRES MOBILES AMELIORES | [2000/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 16.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.02.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.1999 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 22.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/32] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.03.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1999 | 18.03.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1999 | 18.03.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1999 | 18.03.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1999 | 18.03.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.03.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.03.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]FR2450145 (ANGENIEUX CLB SA) [X] 1,2,6-8,11-14,43,53,74-77 * page 2, line 1 - page 5, line 23; figures 1-5A,9-10A * [A] 15-19 [Y] 37-42,44-52,54-56,70; | [Y]FR2632218 (LACOSTE JEAN [FR]) [Y] 57-62 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 17; figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US3251974 (SEYFRIED RICHARD F) [Y] 37-42,44-52,54-62 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 56; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]JPS55149732 ; | [XY]US587695 (BILLING F & PARTRIDGE W E) [X] 53,63-69 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 55; figures 1-9 * [Y] 70 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810210), vol. 005, no. 022, Database accession no. (M - 054), & JP55149732 A 19801121 (INOUE JAPAX RES INC) [X] 57,58 * abstract * [Y] 37-42,44-52,54-56,59-62 | International search | [X]US5304012 (WENDLING ERIC [US]); | [Y]US4900049 (TSENG IKE DIING-HUANG [TW]); | [Y]US4523872 (ARENA ALDO [US], et al); | [A]US3966230 (NICOL JOHN); | [A]US5522280 (BEXTEN DANIEL P [US]) | by applicant | US5404630 | US5188177 |