EP0915930 - METHOD OF TRIGGERING OXYGEN SCAVENGING COMPOSITION WITH PULSED LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. P.O. Box 464 Duncan, SC 29334-0464 / US | [1999/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOK, Philip, H., Jr. 404 Barley Mill Drive Greer, SC 29651 / US | 02 /
CRADDOCK, Melania, M. 205 Kristen Way Greenville, SC 29607 / US | 03 /
FEEHLEY, William, A. 12105 Stoney Batter Kingsville, MD 21087 / US | 04 /
MIRANDA, Nathanael, R. 540 Palmetto Street Spartanburg, SC 29302 / US | 05 /
SPEER, Drew, V. 6229 Slender Sky Columbia, MD 21044 / US | 06 /
THOMAS, Jeffrey, A. 109 Megan Drive Moore, SC 29615 / US | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Barlow, Roy James J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 97935202.8 | 30.07.1997 | [1999/20] | WO1997US13370 | Priority number, date | US19960691828 | 02.08.1996 Original published format: US 691828 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805703 | Date: | 12.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0915930 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0915930 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/28, C08K5/00, A23L3/3436, A23L3/28 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
B65B55/08 (EP,US);
A23L3/26 (EP,US);
A23L3/28 (EP,US);
A23L3/3436 (EP,US);
C08J3/28 (EP,US);
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/20] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR AKTIVIERUNG EINER SAUERSTOFFABSORBIERENDEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT GEPULSTEM LICHT | [1999/20] | English: | METHOD OF TRIGGERING OXYGEN SCAVENGING COMPOSITION WITH PULSED LIGHT | [1999/20] | French: | PROCEDE D'ACTIVATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DESOXYGENANTE PAR LA LUMIERE PULSEE | [1999/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 06.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0189808 (HOECHST CO AMERICAN [US]) [A] 1,6,13,19 * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 14 * * page 12; example 1; table 1 ** claims 1-3,5 *; | [AD]US5034235 (DUNN JOSEPH E [US], et al) [AD] 1-6,13-16,19,20,25 * column 2; figures 1-4,6 * * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 35 * * column 13, line 30 - column 14, line 33 *; | [AD]EP0520257 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [AD] 1,8-10,21,22 * page 3, line 8 - line 15; examples 1,3,8-11; claims 1-3,12,15,16,25-27,34-36 *; | [A]WO9608371 (CHEVRON CHEM CO [US]) [A] 1,10,11,21 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 14, line 12 - line 14; example 1; claims 1,12,20 * |