blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0916223

EP0916223 - RETURN PATH INGRESS NOISE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2003  [2003/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trilithic, Inc.
9202 East 33rd Street
Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US
[1999/20]
Inventor(s)01 / HARRIS, James, E.
8815 Fathom Crest
Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US
[1999/20]
Representative(s)Croston, David, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
2 London Bridge
London SE1 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/20]Croston, David, et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date97935244.031.07.1997
[1999/20]
WO1997US13516
Priority number, dateUS19960023306P31.07.1996         Original published format: US 23306 P
[1999/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9805164
Date:05.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0916223
Date:19.05.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04N7/16
[1999/20]
CPC:
H04H20/12 (EP,US); H04H20/78 (EP,US); H04N17/00 (EP,US);
H04N21/44209 (EP,US); H04N21/6118 (EP,US); H04N21/64723 (EP,US);
H04N5/21 (EP,US); H04N7/16 (EP,US); H04N7/17309 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/20]
TitleGerman:RÜCKLEITUNGSZUGANGSRAUSCHENMESSSYSTEM[1999/20]
English:RETURN PATH INGRESS NOISE MEASUREMENT SYSTEM[1999/20]
French:SYSTEME DE MESURE DU BRUIT DANS UNE ENTREE DE VOIE DE RETOUR[1999/20]
Entry into regional phase19.02.1999National basic fee paid 
19.02.1999Search fee paid 
19.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/20]
14.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/14]
29.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4520508  (REICHERT JR HARRY J [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 19 - line 39 *[A] 2-19
International search[X]US3731203  (LIEBERMAN D);
 [A]US3846703  (STEWART F, et al);
 [A]US3886454  (OAKLEY CHARLES BURKHARDT, et al);
 [X]US4413229  (GRANT WILLIAM O [US]);
 [X]US4491968  (SHIMP RICHARD L [US], et al);
 [X]US5020134  (PECAUT STEVEN C [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.