EP0923378 - PROMOTION OF WOUND HEALING BY CHEMICALLY-MODIFIED TETRACYCLINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE RESEARCH FOUNDATION OF STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK PO Box 9 Albany New York 12201-0009 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states THE RESEARCH FOUNDATION OF STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK PO Box 9 Albany New York 12201-0009 / US | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states THE RESEARCH FOUNDATION OF STATE UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK PO Box 9 Albany, New York 12201-0009 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAMURTHY, Nungavaram, S. 10 Lyman court Smithtown, NY 11787 / US | 02 /
GOLUB, Lorne, M. 29 Whitney Gate Smithtown, NY 11787 / US | 03 /
MCNAMARA, Thomas, F. P.O. Box 44 Port Jefferson, NY 11777 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 97935248.1 | 01.08.1997 | [1999/25] | WO1997US13534 | Priority number, date | US19960691135 | 01.08.1996 Original published format: US 691135 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9805340 | Date: | 12.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923378 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923378 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/65, A61P17/02 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
A61L15/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/65 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61L2300/406 (EP,US);
A61L2300/41 (EP,US);
A61L2300/412 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/25] | A61K31/65 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/25] | Title | German: | FOERDERUNG DER WUNDHEILUNG DURCH CHEMISCH MODIFIZIERTE TETRACYCLINE | [2005/27] | English: | PROMOTION OF WOUND HEALING BY CHEMICALLY-MODIFIED TETRACYCLINES | [1999/25] | French: | ACTIVATION DE CICATRISATION PAR DES TETRACYCLINES CHIMIQUEMENT MODIFIEES | [1999/25] |
Former [1999/25] | FOEDERUNG DER WUNDHEILUNG DURCH CHEMISCH MODIFIZIERTE TETRACYCLINE | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4935412 (MCNAMARA THOMAS F [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 3, line 21 - line 26 * * column 9, line 35 - line 45 * * column 10, line 30 - line 35 *; | [X]US5229380 (HARRIS RICHARD Y [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,14,15 * column 3 - column 4 *; | [A] - GOLUB ET AL, "a non-antibacteral chemically-modified tetracycline inhibits mammalian collagenase activity", J. OF DENTAL RES., (1987), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 1310 - 1314, XP000916466 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4704383 (MCNAMARA THOMAS F [US], et al); | [Y]US5008283 (BLACKBURN JR WARREN D [US], et al); | [Y]US5190937 (MARKWELL ROGER E [US], et al); | [Y]US5240958 (CAMPION COLIN [GB], et al); | [Y]US5308839 (GOLUB LORNE M [US], et al) |