blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0919068

EP0919068 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STARTING DIFFICULT TO START ELECTRODELESS LAMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2003  [2003/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fusion Uv Systems, Inc.
910 Clopper Road
Gaithersburg, MD 20878-1357 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]For all designated states
Fusion Uv Systems, Inc.
910 Clopper Road
Gaitherburg, MD 20878-1357 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FRANK, Jerome, D.
20 Kentbury Way
Bethesda, MD 20814 / US
02 / WOOD, Charles, H.
14725 Janice Drive
Rockville, MD 20853 / US
03 / CEKIC, Miodrag
12130 Turnstone Court
Silver Spring, MD 20904 / US
[1999/22]
Representative(s)Hössle, Markus
Hössle Kudlek & Partner Postfach 10 23 38
70019 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/22]Hössle, Markus, Dipl.-Phys.
Raeck & Hössle Patentanwälte Moserstrasse 8
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97935328.112.08.1997
[1999/22]
WO1997US13929
Priority number, dateUS1996069670614.08.1996         Original published format: US 696706
[1999/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9807182
Date:19.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0919068
Date:02.06.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.02.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01J65/04, H01J61/54
[2000/08]
CPC:
H01J61/547 (EP,US); H01J61/54 (KR); H01J65/044 (EP,US);
H05B41/24 (EP,US); H05B41/382 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/22]H01J65/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/22]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STARTEN SCHWER STARTBAREN, ELEKTRODENLOSEN LAMPEN[1999/22]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STARTING DIFFICULT TO START ELECTRODELESS LAMPS[1999/22]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL SERVANT A METTRE SOUS TENSION DES LAMPES SANS ELECTRODE DIFFICILES A DEMARRER[1999/22]
Entry into regional phase03.12.1998National basic fee paid 
03.12.1998Search fee paid 
03.12.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.12.1998Examination requested  [1999/32]
13.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/49]
03.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]FR2448224  (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US])
International search[Y]US4890042  (WITTING HARALD L [US]);
 [Y]US4894589  (BOROWIEC JOSEPH C [US]);
 [Y]US5047693  (ROBERTS VICTOR D [US], et al);
 [YP]US5504391  (TURNER BRIAN [US], et al)
ExaminationEP0638918
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.