Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0948859
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.08.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |
20.04.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.09.2004 |
First examination report |
|
06.09.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.08.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
16.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.04.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |
11.08.2000 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] |
01.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.07.2000 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |
27.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] |
27.08.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] |
29.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|