EP0948859 - INTERNET-BASED TELEPHONE CALL MANAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/41] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEUBUS, Charles 55 Elm Avenue Westmount, Quebec H3Y 3H9 / CA | 02 /
JODOIN, Sylvain 10435 Parthenais Montreal, Quebec H2B 2L8 / CA | 03 /
BERNARDI, Alan 464 Berwick Town of Mount-Royal, Quebec H3R 1Z9 / CA | [1999/41] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al F. R. KELLY & CO. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2000/37] | Bewley, Ewan Stuart, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [1999/41] | Williamson, Brian, et al Nortel Networks, IP Law Group, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97935406.5 | 14.08.1997 | [1999/41] | WO1997CA00570 | Priority number, date | US19960023903P | 14.08.1996 Original published format: US 23903 P | [1999/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9807266 | Date: | 19.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0948859 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04M3/00, H04M3/50 | [1999/41] | CPC: |
H04M3/537 (EP,US);
H04M3/4228 (EP,US);
H04M3/428 (EP,US);
H04M7/0033 (EP,US);
H04M7/122 (EP,US);
H04M2201/60 (EP,US);
H04M2203/156 (EP,US);
H04M3/42 (EP,US);
H04M3/42161 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/41] | Title | German: | INTERNET-BASIERENDER FERNSPRECHANRUFVERWALTER | [1999/41] | English: | INTERNET-BASED TELEPHONE CALL MANAGER | [1999/41] | French: | GESTIONNAIRE D'APPEL TELEPHONIQUE BASE SUR INTERNET | [1999/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/41] | 09.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.04.1999 | 16.03.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.04.1999 | 16.03.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.04.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.03.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   26.04.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5533110 (PINARD DEBORAH L [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,6,8,12 * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 8 * * figures 1,8 *; | [Y]WO9518501 (GTE LABORATORIES INC [US]) [Y] 3-5 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9720424 (AT & T CORP [US]) [PX] 1-4,6-9,12,14-20 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9726749 (INTERACTIVE TELECOM INC [CA]) [PX] 1-9,12-20 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9737483 (AT & T CORP [US]) [E] 1,2,6-8,12,15,17-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US5363431 (SCHULL JEROME W [US], et al) [A] 3-5 * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 1 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 7 * * figure 4 *; | [A]WO9605684 (QUANTUM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 6, line 5 - page 9, line 29 *; | [A]WO9620553 (ALPHANET TELECOM INC [CA]) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 31 - page 6, line 30 * * page 17, line 19 - line 28 * | [Y] - "WORKSTATION COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19940901), vol. 37, no. 9, pages 101 - 104, XP000473347 [Y] 3-5 * the whole document * | [PX] - RABBAGE R ET AL, "INTERNET PHONE- CHANGING THE TELEPHONY PARADIGM?", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (199704), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 145 - 157, XP000676853 [PX] 1,2,8,11,14,16,18-20 * figures 4-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018601211460 |