EP0928822 - NEW LINEAR ARRANGEMENT OF CONTACT ADHESIVES FOR MULTI-USE APPLICATIONS AND WITH REUSE POSSIBILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Millan Calvo, Fernando Rafael Villa, 10 E-28023 Madrid / ES | [1999/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 21 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 97935580.7 | 13.08.1997 | [1999/28] | WO1997ES00211 | Priority number, date | ES19960001871 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: ES 9601871 | [1999/28] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808908 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928822 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
C09J7/21 (EP);
C09J7/201 (EP);
C09J7/38 (EP);
C09J2301/204 (EP);
C09J2400/283 (EP);
C09J2483/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1999/28] | Title | German: | NEUE, LINEARE ANORDNUNG VON KONTAKTKLEBSTOFFEN FÜR MEHRFACHANWENDUNGEN MIT WIEDERVERWERTUNGSMÖGLICHKEIT | [1999/28] | English: | NEW LINEAR ARRANGEMENT OF CONTACT ADHESIVES FOR MULTI-USE APPLICATIONS AND WITH REUSE POSSIBILITIES | [1999/28] | French: | NOUVELLE DISPOSITION LINEAIRE D'ADHESIFS DE CONTACT POUR APPLICATION MULTI-USAGE ET AVEC POSSIBILITE DE REUTILISATION | [1999/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.1999 | Translation filed | 29.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 01.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2000 | 31.08.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3560319 (KUHLMAN LEO G); | [A]ES262094U ; | [A]ES2045719T (BEIERSDORF AG) |