EP0916196 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING CONNECTION QUALITY, AND A RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SE | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIIRAINEN, Olli Torikatu 27 A 9 FIN-90100 Oulu / FI | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Brockman, Pertti Erik, et al Kolster Oy Ab Elektroniikkatie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Brockman, Pertti Erik, et al Kolster Oy Ab, P.O. Box 148, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 97935583.1 | 11.08.1997 | [1999/20] | WO1997FI00472 | Priority number, date | FI19960003137 | 09.08.1996 Original published format: FI 963137 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9807240 | Date: | 19.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0916196 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0916196 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04L1/20 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
H04L1/20 (EP,US);
H04L1/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER QUALITÄT EINER VERBINDUNG UND EMPFÄNGER | [1999/20] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING CONNECTION QUALITY, AND A RECEIVER | [1999/20] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER LA QUALITE D'UNE CONNEXION, ET RECEPTEUR | [1999/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 04.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2005 | BE | 02.03.2005 | CH | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | FR | 02.03.2005 | IT | 02.03.2005 | LI | 02.03.2005 | NL | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | ES | 13.06.2005 | GB | 11.08.2005 | IE | 11.08.2005 | LU | 11.08.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | [2008/08] |
Former [2007/26] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
FR | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
GB | 11.08.2005 | ||
IE | 11.08.2005 | ||
LU | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
FR | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
GB | 11.08.2005 | ||
IE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
FR | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
IE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
FR | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0302330 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]); | [X]EP0430413 (TECHNOPHONE LTD [GB]); | [X]US5144644 (BORTH DAVID E [US]); | [A]US5502735 (COOPER ANDREW [GB]); | [AP]WO9626583 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) |