EP0930215 - POWER STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2008/11] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAJI, Hiroaki 2-2-7-231, Nogaito-cho, Yamatokooriyama-shi Nara 639-11 / JP | 02 /
SAKAMAKI, Masahiko 1-27, Miyakozuka, Yao-shi Osaka 581 / JP | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Steil, Christian, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/29] | Steil, Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97935785.2 | 13.08.1997 | [1999/29] | WO1997JP02830 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908921 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930215 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930215 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00, B62D123/00, B62D117/00, B62D101/00, B62D113/00 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
B62D5/065 (EP,US);
B62D5/07 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1999/29] | B62D5/07, B62D6/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/29] | Title | German: | SERVOLENKUNG | [1999/29] | English: | POWER STEERING SYSTEM | [1999/29] | French: | SYSTEME DE DIRECTION ASSISTEE | [1999/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1999 | Translation filed | 09.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07022073.6 / EP1900604 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.03.2008 | [2010/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS57140276 ; | [A]JPS63219479 ; | [Y]US4002959 (SCHADLICH FRITZ, et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 1, lines 38-54; claims 1,5 *; | [YA]EP0044733 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * page 16, lines 14-21; claims 4,10 * * page 2, lines 4-12 * [A] 4-7; | [Y]EP0053297 (LANSING GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 5, lines 22,23; claims 2,3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821130), vol. 006, no. 242, Database accession no. (M - 175), & JP57140276 A 19820830 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) [X] 4,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890111), vol. 013, no. 010, Database accession no. (M - 782), & JP63219479 A 19880913 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS57140276 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JPS63219479 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS); | [Y]JPH0446984U ; | [A]JPH08230706 (KOYO SEIKO CO) | by applicant | JPS59118577 |