EP0922231 - METHOD OF MEASUREMENT FOR LOCATING LINE FAULTS ON HVDC LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states ABB AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | ||
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJÖRKLUND, Hans Plommonstigen 23 S-771 43 Ludvika / SE | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1999/34] |
Former [1999/24] | Ryan, John Peter William, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97935925.4 | 05.08.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997SE01323 | Priority number, date | SE19960003129 | 29.08.1996 Original published format: SE 9603129 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9809177 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0922231 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/08 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
G01R31/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/24] | Title | German: | MESSVERFAHREN ZUR FEHLERORTUNG IN HVDC LEITUNGEN | [1999/24] | English: | METHOD OF MEASUREMENT FOR LOCATING LINE FAULTS ON HVDC LINES | [1999/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE SERVANT A LOCALISER DES DEFAUTS SUR DES LIGNES HAUTE TENSION A COURANT CONTINU | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.02.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/14] | 19.11.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3609533 (PARDIS ROBERT J); | [A]US3670240 (MARANCHAK VASILY MAKAROVICH, et al); | [A]EP0358488 (GEC ALSTHOM LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0649029 (FAR EAST MERCANTILE CO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0684678 (GEC ALSTHOM LTD [GB]) |