EP0912736 - A LYSOSOMAL-ASSOCIATED MULTISPANNING MEMBRANE PROTEIN, LAPTM5 AND A NUCLEIC ACID ENCODING LAPTM5 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beth Israel Deaconess Medical Center 330 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Bing 4 Kooper Street Dorcester, MA 02124 / US | 02 /
ADRA, Chaker, N. 1 Devonshire Place, No. 3501 Boston, MA 02109 / US | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97936070.8 | 09.07.1997 | [1999/18] | WO1997US12292 | Priority number, date | US19960021399P | 09.07.1996 Original published format: US 21399 P | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801556 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0912736 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C07K16/18 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/18] | Title | German: | LYSOSOMALES 'MULTISPANNING' MENBRANPROTEIN, LAPTM5, UND DIE DAFÜR KODIERENDE NUKLEINSÄURE | [1999/18] | English: | A LYSOSOMAL-ASSOCIATED MULTISPANNING MEMBRANE PROTEIN, LAPTM5 AND A NUCLEIC ACID ENCODING LAPTM5 | [1999/18] | French: | PROTEINE POSSEDANT UNE MEMBRANE A ECARTEMENT MULTIPLE ET ASSOCIEE A UN LYSOSOME A, LAPTM5 ET ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CODANT LE LAPTM5 | [1999/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 13.02.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/31] | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9413802 (CYTOMED INC [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 12, line 28 - page 14, line 31 *; | [X] - ADRA C.N. AND LIM B., "Identification of an embryonic cDNA for a five-transmembrane juxtanuclear protein preferentially expressed in adult hematopoietic cells.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (199510), vol. 57, no. 4 SUPPL., page A312, XP002048661 [X] 1-27 * column A * | [X] - EMBL Database entry MM29539; Accession number U29539; 10 August 1995; Scott L.M. et al.: 'E3, a hematopoietic-specific transcript directly regulated by the retinoic acid receptor alpha.', XP002048664 [X] 1-25 * column A * | [X] - EMBL Database entry HS304981; Accession number U30498; 7 August 1995; Scott L.M.: 'Human retinoic-acid inducible E3 protein mRNA, complete coding sequence.', XP002048665 [X] 1-25 * column A * | [PX] - ADRA C.N. ET AL., "LAPTM5: A novel lysosomal-associated multispanning membrane protein preferentially expressed hematopoietic cells.", GENOMICS, (19960715), vol. 35, no. 2, pages 328 - 337, XP002048662 [PX] 1-27 * column W * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1996.0364 | [PX] - SCOTT L M ET AL, "E3, a hematopoietic-specific transcript directly regulated by the retinoic acid receptor alpha.", BLOOD, (19961001), vol. 88, no. 7, pages 2517 - 2530, XP002048663 [PX] 1-27 * see the whole document, especially Fig. 2 * |