EP0922075 - REFRIGERANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ineos Fluor Holdings Limited First Floor Offices Queens Gate 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Ineos Fluor Holdings Limited First Floor Offices Queens Gate 15-17 Queens Terrace Southampton, Hampshire SO14 3BP / GB | ||
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POWELL, Richard Llewellyn 9 Sadler's Wells, Bunbury Tarporley, Cheshire CW6 9NU / GB | 02 /
CORR, Stuart 31 Foxhills Close, Appleton Warrington, Cheshire WA4 5DH / GB | 03 /
MURPHY, Frederick Thomas 53 Fairways Frodsham, Cheshire WA6 7RY / GB | 04 /
MORRISON, James David 39 Sandown Crescent, Cuddington Northwich, Cheshire CW8 2QN / GB | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97936797.6 | 18.08.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997GB02197 | Priority number, date | GB19960018180 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: GB 9618180 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808911 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0922075 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0922075 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP);
C09K2205/22 (EP);
C09K2205/34 (EP);
C09K2205/41 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/24] | Title | German: | KÜHLMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1999/24] | English: | REFRIGERANT COMPOSITIONS | [1999/24] | French: | COMPOSITIONS REFRIGERANTES | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 18.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis MN 55408 / US Opponent's representative Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US Opponent's representative Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | 10.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.04.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 04.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.06.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.07.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.07.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.04.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/08] | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 20.09.2005 | Appeal received No. T1233/05 | 30.11.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.04.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 24.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2001 | CH | 07.11.2001 | FI | 07.11.2001 | GR | 07.11.2001 | LI | 07.11.2001 | DK | 07.02.2002 | PT | 07.02.2002 | SE | 07.02.2002 | LU | 18.08.2002 | IE | 19.08.2002 | MC | 01.03.2003 | [2006/44] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
LU | 18.08.2002 | ||
IE | 19.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
IE | 19.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
IE | 19.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
FI | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/33] | FI | 07.11.2001 | |
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 07.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0433989 ; | [X]WO9311201 (US ENVIRONMENT [US]) [X] 1-3,9-11,17 * page 13, line 24 - line 26 * * tables 1,6 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 12, Database accession no. 92-091756, XP002048669 & JPH0433989 A 19920205 (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |