EP0836754 - COUPLED MULTI-SEGMENT HELICAL ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | ||
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 6455 Lusk Boulevard San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILIPOVIC, Daniel 3863 Ingraham Street E-306 San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
TASSOUDJI, Ali 5240 Fiore Terrace 202 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al Tomkins & Co. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/17] | Walsh, Michael Joseph, et al TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 97936928.7 | 28.04.1997 | [1998/17] | WO1997US07110 | Priority number, date | US19960640298 | 30.04.1996 Original published format: US 640298 | [1998/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9741695 | Date: | 06.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0836754 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836754 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/00 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
H01Q11/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/17] | Extension states | AL | 15.12.1997 | LT | 15.12.1997 | LV | 15.12.1997 | RO | 15.12.1997 | SI | 15.12.1997 | Title | German: | WENDELANTENNE MIT GEKOPPELTEN VIELFACH-SEGMENTEN | [1998/17] | English: | COUPLED MULTI-SEGMENT HELICAL ANTENNA | [1998/17] | French: | ANTENNE HELICOIDALE A SEGMENTS MULTIPLES COUPLES | [1998/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1997 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/17] | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.11.2002 | BE | 06.11.2002 | CH | 06.11.2002 | GR | 06.11.2002 | LI | 06.11.2002 | NL | 06.11.2002 | DK | 06.02.2003 | PT | 06.02.2003 | LU | 28.04.2003 | ES | 29.05.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
LU | 28.04.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
ES | 29.05.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
BE | 06.11.2002 | ||
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
CH | 06.11.2002 | ||
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
LI | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 06.11.2002 | |
GR | 06.11.2002 | ||
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 06.11.2002 | |
NL | 06.11.2002 | ||
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 06.11.2002 | |
PT | 06.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 06.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4148030 (FOLDES PETER) [X] 1-7,9-20,22-26 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 51; figures 1,4,5 * [Y] 8,21; | [YD]US5198831 (BURRELL GARY L [US], et al) [YD] 8,21* column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 17; figures 5,6 *; | [XP]WO9711507 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [XP] 1-4,7,10-18,20,23-26 * page 13, line 27 - page 15, line 6 * * page 16, line 23 - page 16, line 32; figures 13A,13B,14,16 * | Examination | US5198831 |