EP0910781 - COMPACT AUTOLOADER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Design Howden 16952 Millikan Avenue Irvine, CA 92606 / US | [1999/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDEN, Michael, D. 429 Isabella Terrace Corona del Mar, CA 92625 / US | 02 /
YU, Dino, K. 2741 Via Cielo Drive Corona, CA 91720 / US | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97936954.3 | 07.07.1997 | [1999/17] | WO1997US11868 | Priority number, date | US19960680912 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: US 680912 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9802703 | Date: | 22.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0910781 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0910781 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.01.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F41A9/00 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
F41A9/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/17] | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE AUTOMATISCHE LADEVORRICHTUNG | [1999/17] | English: | COMPACT AUTOLOADER | [1999/17] | French: | AUTOCHARGEUR COMPACT | [1999/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 12.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/17] | 16.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2005 | BE | 11.05.2005 | CH | 11.05.2005 | FR | 11.05.2005 | IT | 11.05.2005 | LI | 11.05.2005 | NL | 11.05.2005 | IE | 07.07.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
IT | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 07.07.2005 | ||
FR | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
IT | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 07.07.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
IE | 07.07.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US3241447 (MAURITZ CHRISTIANSSON CARL); | [Y]US4038906 (TIDSTROM BROR ERLING); | [A]US4079659 (GUSTAVSSON LARS G T, et al); | [A]US4640181 (SCHIELE AUGUST [DE], et al); | [X]US4690031 (METZ JOSEF [DE], et al); | [A]US4928574 (GOLDEN MICHAEL D [US]); | [X]US4947728 (MUEHLHAUSEN PETER [DE], et al); | [A]US5196643 (JOERG JOSEF [US], et al); | [A]US5440966 (TELLANDER ROBERT M [US], et al) | by applicant | US4928574 |