EP0968025 - ANNULAR CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lev, Shlomo Ahronowitz Street 25 Holon 58445 / IL | [2000/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Warren, Anthony Robert, et al BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97937227.3 | 18.08.1997 | [2000/01] | WO1997US14236 | Priority number, date | IL19960119189 | 03.09.1996 Original published format: IL 11918996 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9809678 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0968025 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M29/00, A61M37/00, A61N1/30 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
A61F2/82 (EP,US);
A61M25/00 (KR);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61M29/02 (EP,US);
A61N2/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | RINGFÖRMIGER KATHETER | [2000/01] | English: | ANNULAR CATHETER | [2000/01] | French: | CATHETER ANNULAIRE | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 19.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 06.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 12.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 29.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/38] | 07.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3812841 (ISAACSON L); | [A]US4315509 (SMIT JULIE A); | [Y]US5409460 (KRUMME JOHN F [US]); | [A]US5445646 (EUTENEUER CHARLES L [US], et al); | [A]US5540712 (KLESHINSKI STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [AP]US5571135 (FRASER PHLAYNE M [US], et al) | by applicant | US5089006 |