EP0921852 - DEVICE FOR THE MIXING OR SEPARATION OF SUBSTANCES OF VARYING MASS AND/OR DENSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/24] | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE MIXING OR SEPARATION OF SUBSTANCES OF VARYING MASS AND/OR DENSITY | ||
[2000/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krämer, Norbert Röntgenstrasse 68 64291 Darmstadt / DE | [1999/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Mierswa, Klaus Iridium IP Friedrich-König-Strasse 3-5 68167 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Mierswa, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrichstrasse 171 68199 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97937462.6 | 18.08.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997DE01776 | Priority number, date | DE1996132875 | 16.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19632875 | [1999/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9807507 | Date: | 26.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921852 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921852 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01F11/00 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
B04B9/10 (EP);
B01F31/23 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/24] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERMISCHEN ODER TRENNEN VON SUBSTANZEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER MASSE UND/ODER DICHTE | [2000/48] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE MIXING OR SEPARATION OF SUBSTANCES OF VARYING MASS AND/OR DENSITY | [2000/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE MELANGE OU LA SEPARATION DE SUBSTANCES PRESENTANT DES MASSES ET/OU DENSITES DIFFERENTES | [2000/48] |
Former [1999/24] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERMISCHEN ODER TRENNEN VON SUBSTANZEN UNTERSCHIEDLICHER MASSE UND/ODER DICHTE | ||
Former [1999/24] | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE MIXING OR SEPARATION OF SUBSTANCES OF VARYING MASS AND/OR DENSITY | ||
Former [1999/24] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE MELANGE OU LA SEPARATION DE SUBSTANCES PRESENTANT DES MASSES ET/OU DENSITES DIFFERENTES | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.06.2001 | GB | 27.06.2001 | IT | 27.06.2001 | NL | 27.06.2001 | AT | 18.08.2001 | BE | 31.08.2001 | CH | 31.08.2001 | LI | 31.08.2001 | SE | 27.09.2001 | ES | 20.12.2001 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/35] | FR | 27.06.2001 | |
GB | 27.06.2001 | ||
NL | 27.06.2001 | ||
AT | 18.08.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
SE | 27.09.2001 | ||
ES | 20.12.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GB | 27.06.2001 | |
NL | 27.06.2001 | ||
AT | 18.08.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
SE | 27.09.2001 | ||
ES | 20.12.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/10] | GB | 27.06.2001 | |
NL | 27.06.2001 | ||
AT | 18.08.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
SE | 27.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | GB | 27.06.2001 | |
NL | 27.06.2001 | ||
BE | 31.08.2001 | ||
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
SE | 27.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 27.06.2001 | |
CH | 31.08.2001 | ||
LI | 31.08.2001 | ||
SE | 27.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | GB | 27.06.2001 | |
SE | 27.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/16] | GB | 27.06.2001 | |
SE | 27.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 27.09.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1465583 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT) [X] 1,2,5* figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]US4146364 (MCCORMICK JAMES B) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 1, line 59 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 3 *; | [X]DE9311112U (LABORTECHNIK GERHARD FROEBEL F [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * figure .; claim - *; | [A]WO9613323 (RED DEVIL EQUIP CO [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |