EP0858323 - PROCESS TO MANUFACTURE IMPLANTS CONTAINING LEUPROLIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/34] | PROCESS TO MANUFACTURE IMPLANTS CONTAINING BIOACTIVE PEPTIDES | ||
[2003/32] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ardana Bioscience Limited 58 Queen Street Edinburgh EH2 3NS / GB | [2002/41] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states DEGHENGHI, Romano Chesaux Dessus B1 CH-1264 S.-Cergue / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deghenghi, Romano Chesaux Dessus B1 1264 S.-Cergue / CH | [2002/41] |
Former [1998/34] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | McNeeney, Stephen Phillip, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | McNeeney, Stephen Phillip, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2002/41] | Miles, John Stephen Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1999/11] | Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr. Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/34] | Spadaro, Marco Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97937521.9 | 28.07.1997 | [1998/34] | WO1997EP04095 | Priority number, date | US19960025444P | 04.09.1996 Original published format: US 25444 P | US19970897942 | 21.07.1997 Original published format: US 897942 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9809613 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858323 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0858323 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/20, A61K9/70 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K9/204 (EP,US);
A61K9/2095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON IMPLANTATEN, DIE LEUPROLID ENTHALTEN | [2003/32] | English: | PROCESS TO MANUFACTURE IMPLANTS CONTAINING LEUPROLIDE | [2003/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D' IMPLANTS CONTENANT DU LEUPROLIDE | [2003/32] |
Former [1998/34] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG BIOAKTIVE PEPTIDE ENTHALTENDER IMPLANTATE | ||
Former [1998/34] | PROCESS TO MANUFACTURE IMPLANTS CONTAINING BIOACTIVE PEPTIDES | ||
Former [1998/34] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'IMPLANTS CONTENANT DES PEPTIDES BIOACTIFS | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 13.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 04.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.01.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Durect Corporation 10240 Bubb Road Cupertino CA 95014-4166 / US Opponent's representative Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.01.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Durect Corporation 10240 Bubb Road Cupertino CA 95014-4166 / US Opponent's representative Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.01.2005
06.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Durect Corporation 10240 Bubb Road Cupertino CA 95014-4166 / US Opponent's representative Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO., Gray's Inn, 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.01.2005
Durect Corporation 10240 Bubb Road Cupertino CA 95014-4166 / US Opponent's representative Woods, Geoffrey Corlett J.A. KEMP & CO., Gray's Inn, 14 South Square London WC1R 5JJ / GB | 04.02.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.10.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.11.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2007 | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 27.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2007 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3822459 (BPD BIOPHARM DEV LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2234169 (DEBIOPHARM SA [CH]); | [A]GB2249725 (DEBIO RECH PHARMA SA [CH]); | [A]CH685285 (DEBIO RECH PHARMA SA); | [A]US5456917 (WISE DONALD L [US], et al) | Examination | - ASANO M. ET AL, "Application of poly DL- lactic acids of varying molecular weight in drug delivery systems", DRUG DESIGN AND DELIVERY, (1990), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 301 - 320 |