EP0964778 - TREAD ROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kistner, Rolf Uferring 18 83317 Teisendorf / DE | [2002/34] |
Former [1999/51] | For all designated states Kistner, Rolf Fellach 6A 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/51] | Representative(s) | Fritsche, Rainer Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Fritsche, Rainer, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Arnulfstrasse 25 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97937531.8 | 30.07.1997 | [1999/51] | WO1997EP04151 | Priority number, date | DE1996130811 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19630811 | DE1997115721 | 15.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19715721 | [1999/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804400 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0964778 | Date: | 22.12.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0964778 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B29D31/00 | [1999/51] | CPC: |
B29D99/0032 (EP);
A63C17/223 (EP);
B29C45/14311 (EP);
B29C45/1459 (EP);
B29C2045/14327 (EP);
B29K2705/02 (EP);
B29L2031/32 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/51] | Title | German: | LAUFROLLE | [1999/51] | English: | TREAD ROLLER | [1999/51] | French: | GALET DE ROULEMENT | [1999/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.1998 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1998 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | FR | 31.07.2003 | [2008/42] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 09.04.2003 | |
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 09.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE945072 (ERNST RENNEBAUM DIPL KFM) [DA] 1,9; | [A]FR2462596 (PARIS & DU RHONE [FR])[A] 1,9; | [A]GB2084508 (EVENTHALL LEON HARRY) [A] 1,9; | [A]GB2118101 (TRIUMPH ADLER AG) [A] 1,9; | [A]US4588542 (PIERCE OWEN A [US]) [A] 1,9; | [A]FR2572988 (NIPPON SEIKO KK [JP]) [A] 1,9; | [A]EP0298356 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1,9; | [A]US5312844 (GONSIOR STANLEY W [US], et al) [A] 1,9 |