EP0956011 - USE OF ARACHIDONIC ACID AND/OR DOCOSAHEXANOIC ACID FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF DYSPRAXIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scarista Limited Victoria House 26 Victoria Street Douglas Isle of Man / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Scarista Limited Victoria House 26 Victoria Street Douglas Isle of Man / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | For all designated states SCOTIA HOLDINGS PLC Weyvern House, Weyvern Park, Portsmouth Road, Peasmarsh Guildford, Surrey GU3 1NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORROBIN, David Frederick, Scotia Holdings plc Scotia House, Castle Business Park Stirling FK9 4TZ / GB | 02 /
STORDY, Barbara Jacqueline, Scotia Pharm. Ltd Weyvern House, Weyvern Park, Portsmouth Road Peasmarsh, Guildford, Surrey GU3 1NA / GB | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1999/46] | Farwell, William Robert, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 97937714.0 | 26.08.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997GB02282 | Priority number, date | GB19960017847 | 27.08.1996 Original published format: GB 9617847 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808501 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0956011 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0956011 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/202 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K31/20 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/46] | A61K31/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ARACHIDONSÄURE UND/ODER DOCOHEXAENSÄURE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DYSPRAXIA | [1999/46] | English: | USE OF ARACHIDONIC ACID AND/OR DOCOSAHEXANOIC ACID FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR THE TREATMENT OF DYSPRAXIA | [1999/46] | French: | UTILISATION D'ACIDE ARACHIDONIQUE ET/OU D'ACIDE DOCOSAHEXANOIQUE DANS LA FABRICATION D'UN MEDICAMENT DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT DE LA DYSPRAXIE | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 31.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 27.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Request for further processing for: | 21.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.06.2002 | BE | 26.06.2002 | CH | 26.06.2002 | FI | 26.06.2002 | FR | 26.06.2002 | GR | 26.06.2002 | IT | 26.06.2002 | LI | 26.06.2002 | NL | 26.06.2002 | DK | 26.09.2002 | PT | 26.09.2002 | SE | 26.09.2002 | DE | 27.09.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/31] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
FI | 26.06.2002 | ||
FR | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
DE | 27.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
FI | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
DE | 27.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
DE | 27.09.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
DE | 27.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
DK | 26.09.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
DE | 27.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
DE | 27.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
GR | 26.06.2002 | ||
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
NL | 26.06.2002 | ||
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 26.06.2002 | |
SE | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | SE | 26.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A] - M.WELLER ET AL., "VERY-LATE-ONSET ADRENOLEUKODYSTROPHY:POSSIBLE PRECIPITATION OF DEMYELINATION BY CEREBRAL CONTUSION", NEUROLOGY, USA, (199202), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 367 - 370, XP002051780 [A] 1-5 * abstract * |