|
07.03.2008 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the EP procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.07.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2001 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2001 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.1998 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.1998 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |