01.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
03.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
07.03.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
15.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
30.03.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] |
24.03.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.03.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.11.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.09.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
22.09.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
22.09.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
22.09.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
09.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2006 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.11.2005 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
31.08.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.10.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.02.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.10.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.10.2003 |
First examination report |
|
05.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.07.2001 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] |
06.07.2001 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] |
01.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.10.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
08.10.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |
10.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|