EP0957888 - LIP TREATMENT CONTAINING A YEAST CELL DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/47] | LIP TREATMENT CONTAINING LIVE YEAST CELL DERIVATIVE | ||
[2006/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVON PRODUCTS, INC. 1251 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10020-1196 / US | [1999/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCANCARELLA, Neil 781 Highview Drive Wyckoff, NJ 07481 / US | 02 /
PAHLCK, Harold 36 Leonard Drive Waldwick, NJ 07463 / US | 03 /
RAOUF, Maha 701 Somerset Street Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97938195.1 | 07.08.1997 | [1999/47] | WO1997US13997 | Priority number, date | US19960705779 | 30.08.1996 Original published format: US 705779 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9808484 | Date: | 05.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0957888 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0957888 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/99, A61Q19/00, A61K36/06 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
A61Q19/001 (EP,US);
A61K8/9728 (EP,US);
A61Q1/04 (EP,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/34] | A61K7/025, A61K7/027, A61K7/48 | ||
Former IPC [1999/47] | A61K7/025, A61K7/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] | Title | German: | LIPPENBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL ENTHALTEND EIN DERIVAT VON HEFEZELLEN | [2006/43] | English: | LIP TREATMENT CONTAINING A YEAST CELL DERIVATIVE | [2006/43] | French: | TRAITEMENT LABIAL CONTENANT UN DERIVE DE CELLULES DE LEVURE | [2006/43] |
Former [1999/47] | LIPPENBEHANDLUNGSMITTEL ENTHALTEND EIN DERIVAT LEBENDER HEFEZELLEN | ||
Former [1999/47] | LIP TREATMENT CONTAINING LIVE YEAST CELL DERIVATIVE | ||
Former [1999/47] | TRAITEMENT LABIAL CONTENANT UN DERIVE DE CELLULES DE LEVURE VIVANTES | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 26.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2006 | 21.09.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2007 | BE | 02.05.2007 | CH | 02.05.2007 | DK | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | LI | 02.05.2007 | NL | 02.05.2007 | SE | 02.08.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | IE | 07.08.2007 | LU | 07.08.2007 | ES | 13.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
IE | 07.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5397773 (DONZIS BYRON A [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 1, lines 64-66 * * column 2, lines 22-53; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2716802 (PACIFIC CORP [KR]) [X] 1,3-14,20* claim 1; table 5 * | International search | [Y]US4873078 (EDMUNDSON ROBERT J [US], et al) | Examination | EP0790054 |