Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0946840
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
31.01.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
09.10.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
02.10.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
19.04.2002 |
First examination report |
|
13.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.07.2000 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
14.07.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] |
20.08.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
20.08.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
25.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.05.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.04.1998 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|