EP0946840 - CONNECTOR FOR SECURING A CONDUIT TO A FLUID SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE COLEMAN COMPANY, INC. 3600 North Hydraulic Avenue Wichita, Kansas 67219 / US | [1999/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Franklin, T. 1203 Sunset Drive Mulvane, KS 67110 / US | 02 /
HUGUET, Alain, J. 36, rue Nuzilly F-69300 Caluire et Cuire / FR | 03 /
SCREMIN, Gerard, A. 147, boulevard Pinel F-69500 Bron / FR | 04 /
MAY, Randall, L. 210 East Kerry Lynn Lane Andover, KS 67002 / US | 05 /
LONG, Norris, R. 5166 South Vine Wichita, KS 67217 / US | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [1999/40] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau, 12 rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 97938233.0 | 12.08.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997US14091 | Priority number, date | US19960695424 | 12.08.1996 Original published format: US 695424 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9806965 | Date: | 19.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946840 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L17/00, F24C3/14 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
F16L37/252 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/40] | F16L17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/40] | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG ZUM ANSCHLIESSEN VON LEITUNGEN AN EINE FLUIDQUELLE | [1999/40] | English: | CONNECTOR FOR SECURING A CONDUIT TO A FLUID SOURCE | [1999/40] | French: | RACCORD DE RETENUE D'UN CONDUIT SUR UNE SOURCE DE FLUIDE | [1999/40] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 11.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2431653 (UTILISATION RATION GAZ [FR]) [Y] 1,8* the whole document *; | [Y]US4207934 (SCREMIN GERARD [FR], et al) [Y] 1,8 * column W *; | [Y]FR2583134 (UTILISATION RATION GAZ [FR]) [Y] 1,8 * THE WHOLE DOCUMENT, ESPECIALLY FIGURE 5 AND PAGE 3 *; | [Y]GB2186652 (MEDIZIN LABORTECHNIK VEB K) [Y] 1,8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US945517 (GOODWIN WILLIAM [GB]); | [A]US2860820 (FALLIGANT LOUIS A); | [A]US3041089 (WILLIAM PURVES FREDERICK); | [A]US3620266 (RYDER FRANCIS E) |