EP0859977 - INTERACTION AREA FOR DATA REPRESENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eidgenössische Technische Hochschule, Eth Zentrum, Institut für Konstruktion und Bauweisen Meier, Markus, Tannenstrasse 3 8092 Zürich / CH | [1998/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BICHSEL, Martin Bogwisstrasse 10 8544 Bertschikon / CH | 02 /
RAUTERBERG, Mathias de kaarsenmaker 2 5283 NK Boxtel / NL | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach 8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 97938724.8 | 11.09.1997 | [1998/35] | WO1997CH00336 | Priority number, date | CH19960002229 | 12.09.1996 Original published format: CH 222996 | CH19960002255 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: CH 225596 | [1998/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9813745 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0859977 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
G06F3/0425 (EP);
G06F3/002 (EP);
G06F3/033 (EP);
G06F3/0354 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1998/35] | Title | German: | INTERAKTIONSRAUM ZUR DARSTELLUNG VON DATEN | [1998/35] | English: | INTERACTION AREA FOR DATA REPRESENTATION | [1998/35] | French: | ZONE D'INTERACTION POUR REPRESENTATION DE DONNEES | [1998/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/10] | 12.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0622722 (RANK XEROX LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9101543 (BELL COMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH, INC.) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4561017 (GREENE RICHARD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A] - "THE TRACKING CUBE: A THREE-DIMENSIONAL INPUT DEVICE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198908), vol. 32, no. 3B, pages 91 - 95, XP000029910 [A] 1 * the whole document * |