EP0921984 - BARREL WITH A LID AND CLAMPING RING CLOSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAUSER-WERKE GmbH & Co. KG Schildgesstrasse 71 - 163 50321 Brühl / DE | [2004/14] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states MAUSER-WERKE GmbH Schildgesstrasse 71 - 163 D-50321 Brühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRZYTULLA, Dietmar Gustav-Heinemann-Strasse 64 D-50171 Kerpen / DE | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | König, Reimar König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | König, Reimar König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | König, Reimar König-Szynka-von Renesse Patentanwälte Lohengrinstrasse 11 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97938820.4 | 11.07.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997EP03690 | Priority number, date | DE19962012506U | 19.07.1996 Original published format: DE 29612506 U | [1999/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9803405 | Date: | 29.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0921984 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0921984 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/00, B65D45/30 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
B65D11/06 (EP,US);
B65D88/00 (KR);
B65D45/345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/24] | Title | German: | DECKELFASS MIT FASSDECKEL UND SPANNRINGVERSCHLUSS | [1999/24] | English: | BARREL WITH A LID AND CLAMPING RING CLOSURE | [1999/24] | French: | FUT A COUVERCLE MUNI D'UN COUVERCLE ET D'UN SYSTEME DE FERMETURE A COLLIER DE SERRAGE | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Schütz GmbH & Co. KGaA Schützstrasse 56242 Selters / DE Opponent's representative Pürckhauer, Rolf Am Rosenwald 25 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.08.2002
ADMISSIBLE Schütz GmbH & Co. KGaA 56242 Selters / DE Opponent's representative Pürckhauer, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Am Rosenwald 25 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | 01.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.04.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.04.2003 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 28.07.2003 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.04.2004 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.08.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2004/44] | Appeal following opposition | 12.06.2004 | Appeal received No. T0754/04 | 19.08.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 21.11.2001 | IE | 21.11.2001 | IT | 21.11.2001 | NL | 21.11.2001 | DK | 21.02.2002 | SE | 21.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | [2008/08] |
Former [2004/43] | GR | 21.11.2001 | |
IE | 21.11.2001 | ||
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | GR | 21.11.2001 | |
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 21.11.2001 | |
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
DK | 21.02.2002 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | GR | 21.11.2001 | |
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GR | 21.11.2001 | |
NL | 21.11.2001 | ||
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 21.11.2001 | |
SE | 21.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 21.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4236338 (MAUSER WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 2, line 32 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 11 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]FR2708914 (ABZAC SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 5 - page 4, line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9608416 (MAUSER WERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 9 * * page 13, line 15 - page 13, line 35 * * figures 5,11,12 *; | [PX]DE29612506U (MAUSER WERKE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-20* the whole document * |