EP0937306 - ROCKER ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASHLEY & ROCK LIMITED P.O. Box No. 1 Morecambe Road Ulverston Cumbria LA12 9BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states ASHLEY & ROCK LIMITED P.O. Box No. 1 Morecambe Road Ulverston Cumbria LA12 9BN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARTON, Stephen, David 163 Jersey Road Osterley Middlesex TW7 4QJ / GB | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | McNeight, David Leslie, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | McNeight, David Leslie, et al McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97939030.9 | 05.09.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997GB02376 | Priority number, date | GB19960019253 | 14.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9619253 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9811575 | Date: | 19.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937306 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937306 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H5/02 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
H01H5/02 (EP);
H01H2239/076 (EP);
H01H2300/03 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP);
Y04S20/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | WIPPTASTENANORDNUNG | [1999/34] | English: | ROCKER ARRANGEMENT | [1999/34] | French: | ENSEMBLE INTERRUPTEUR A BASCULE | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.06.1999 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | 29.06.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.06.1999 | M01   Fee paid on   16.06.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.2001 | BE | 25.04.2001 | CH | 25.04.2001 | FI | 25.04.2001 | FR | 25.04.2001 | IT | 25.04.2001 | LI | 25.04.2001 | NL | 25.04.2001 | DK | 25.07.2001 | SE | 25.07.2001 | DE | 26.07.2001 | PT | 26.07.2001 | GR | 27.07.2001 | IE | 05.09.2001 | LU | 05.09.2001 | MC | 05.09.2001 | ES | 30.10.2001 | [2008/08] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
FR | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
NL | 25.04.2001 | ||
DK | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
GR | 27.07.2001 | ||
IE | 05.09.2001 | ||
LU | 05.09.2001 | ||
MC | 05.09.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
NL | 25.04.2001 | ||
DK | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
GR | 27.07.2001 | ||
IE | 05.09.2001 | ||
LU | 05.09.2001 | ||
MC | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
NL | 25.04.2001 | ||
DK | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
IE | 05.09.2001 | ||
LU | 05.09.2001 | ||
MC | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
NL | 25.04.2001 | ||
DK | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
IE | 05.09.2001 | ||
MC | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
ES | 30.10.2001 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
NL | 25.04.2001 | ||
DK | 25.07.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
IE | 05.09.2001 | ||
MC | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
NL | 25.04.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
IE | 05.09.2001 | ||
MC | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
IE | 05.09.2001 | ||
MC | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
MC | 05.09.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
PT | 26.07.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
FR | 21.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
CH | 25.04.2001 | ||
FI | 25.04.2001 | ||
LI | 25.04.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
DE | 26.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | AT | 25.04.2001 | |
BE | 25.04.2001 | ||
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/12] | BE | 25.04.2001 | |
SE | 25.07.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 25.07.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3193642 (ETIENNE LIESSE MAURICE) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 40 - line 55; figure . *; | [A]DE2658264 (RAGHEB) [A] 1 * page 20, paragraph L - page 22, paragraph 2; figures 4-6 *; | [A] - K.A.LENNON, "Spring and magnet keyboard actuator", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK (US), (198201), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 4314 - 4315, XP002046292 [A] 1 * page 4314 - page 4315; figure 1 * |