EP0939513 - TRANSMITTER, RECEIVER, TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, SENDING METHOD, RECEIVING METHOD, AND TRANSMITTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Takayasu 6-5-5, Kibougaoka Toyono-cho Toyono-gun Osaka 563-02 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Masatoshi 208 Rohreru-Higashiikoma 1-62, Higashiikoma Ikoma-shi Nara 630-02 / JP | 03 /
NISHIOKA Minoru 2-1-20-510, Uozaki-nishimachi Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658 / JP | 04 /
BANNAI, Tatsushi 389-12, Kitanoda Sakai-shi Osaka 588 / JP | 05 /
NISHINO, Masakazu 1-4-26, Kamiichi Kashiwara-shi Osaka 582 / JP | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Ehlers, Jochen Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Ehlers, Jochen Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1999/35] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97939204.0 | 05.09.1997 | [1999/35] | WO1997JP03142 | Priority number, date | JP19960234858 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23485896 | JP19970045603 | 28.02.1997 Original published format: JP 4560397 | JP19970189400 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: JP 18940097 | [1999/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810557 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939513 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/08, H04L1/00, H03M7/40, H04J3/00, H04N7/00, H04N7/50 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
H04N21/4302 (EP);
H04L7/08 (KR);
H04N21/43072 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/004 (EP);
H04N19/60 (EP);
H04N19/68 (EP);
H04N19/89 (EP);
H04N21/234318 (EP);
H04N21/235 (EP);
H04N21/2365 (EP);
H04N21/2383 (EP);
H04N21/242 (EP);
H04N21/4305 (EP);
H04N21/434 (EP);
H04N21/4347 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/35] | H04L7/08, H04L1/00, H03M7/40, H04J3/00, H04N7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1999/35] | Title | German: | SENDER, EMPFÄNGER, ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM, SENDEVERFAHREN , EMPFANGSVERFAHREN UND ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [1999/35] | English: | TRANSMITTER, RECEIVER, TRANSMISSION SYSTEM, SENDING METHOD, RECEIVING METHOD, AND TRANSMITTING METHOD | [1999/35] | French: | EMETTEUR, RECEPTEUR, SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION, PROCEDE D'EMISSION, PROCEDE DE RECEPTION ET PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION | [1999/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1999 | Translation filed | 26.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 26.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 26.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 02.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/45] | Divisional application(s) | EP02014215.4 / EP1261164 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06326967 ; | [A]JPH08205146 ; | [A]EP0527611 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-71 * figure 1A *; | [A]US5289277 (BLANCHARD DAVID L [US], et al)[A] 1-71; | [A]EP0668677 (LEADER ELECTRONICS [JP]) [A] 1-71 * page 3, line 16 - page 3, line 23 *; | [A]EP0711080 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-71 * column 1, line 14 - column 1, line 35 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950531), vol. 199, no. 502, & JP06326967 A 19941125 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO) [A] 1-71 * abstract * | [DA] - SMPTE, "Proposed Standard for Television - 10-Bit 4:2:2 Component and 4 fsc NTSC Composite Digital Signals - Serial Digital Interface; SMPTE 259M", SMPTE JOURNAL, White Plains, NY, US, (1993), vol. 102, no. 2, pages 174 - 179, XP000349969 [DA] 1-71 | [A] - K.Y. REYNOLDS, "Digital Video and Audio Transmission Alternatives", SMPTE JOURNAL, (199608), vol. 105, no. 8, pages 479 - 482, XP000627182 [A] 1-71 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 199, no. 612, & JP08205146 A 19960809 (HITACHI DENSHI LTD) [A] 1-71 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH06326967 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH06343065 (SONY CORP); | [A]US5477368 (ESKILDSEN LARS E [US], et al); | [Y]WO9605677 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH08205146 (HITACHI ELECTRONICS, et al); | [P]JPH09135227 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC) |