blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978090

EP0978090 - CELLULAR TELEPHONE COMPRISING A SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE (SIM) CARD HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/06]SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE (SIM) CARD HOLDER
[2003/25]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/34]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2004/19]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
16483 Stockholm / SE
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / STRAND, Oscar
Jularpsvägen 3B
S-243 32 Höör / SE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Onshage, Anders Christer, et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms
221 83 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [2004/11]Onshage, Anders Christer, et al
Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms
221 83 Lund / SE
Former [2000/06]Onshage, Anders
Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, IPR Department, Nya Vattentornet
221 83 Lund / SE
Application number, filing date97939275.029.08.1997
[2000/06]
WO1997SE01449
Priority number, dateUS1996070581630.08.1996         Original published format: US 705816
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9809249
Date:05.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978090
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978090
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.03.1998
ClassificationIPC:G06K13/08, G06K7/06
[2000/06]
CPC:
G06K13/08 (EP,KR,US); G06K7/0021 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:FUNKTELEFON MIT SIM-KARTENHALTER[2003/25]
English:CELLULAR TELEPHONE COMPRISING A SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE (SIM) CARD HOLDER[2003/25]
French:TELEPHONE CELLULAIRE AVEC SUPPORT DE CARTE DE MODULE D'IDENTIFICATION D'ABONNE[2003/25]
Former [2000/06]SIM-KARTENHALTER
Former [2000/06]SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE (SIM) CARD HOLDER
Former [2000/06]SUPPORT DE CARTE DE MODULE D'IDENTIFICATION D'ABONNE
Entry into regional phase11.02.1999National basic fee paid 
11.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
11.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
27.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2004Fee for grant paid
14.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
FR18.08.2004
IT18.08.2004
GB18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
[2008/08]
Former [2006/32]BE18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
FR18.08.2004
GB18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2006/13]BE18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
GB18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2005/28]BE18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2005/23]FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
ES29.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/10]SE18.11.2004
Cited inInternational search[X]US5257414  (TRAHAN DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9,11-15 * claims 1,2,7 *;
 [X]DE19521360  (AMPHENOL TUCHEL ELECT [DE]) [X] 1-3,9-13,15* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.