EP0922342 - IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, MULTI-CARRIER TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics N.V. World Trade Center, Strawinskylaan 1725 1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics N.V. World Trade Center, Strawinskylaan 1725 1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states TELIA AB Marbackagatan 11 123 86 Farsta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISAKSSON, Mikael Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Magnus Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 03 /
TONVALL, Harry Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 04 /
OLSSON, Lennart Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 05 /
STEFANSSON, Tomas Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 06 /
ÖHMAN, Hans Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 07 /
BAHLENBERG, Gunnar Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 08 /
ISAKSSON, Anders Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 09 /
ÖKVIST, Göran Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 10 /
LJUNGGREN, Lis-Marie Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 11 /
NORDSTRÖM, Tomas Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 12 /
ISAKSSON, Lars-Ake Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 13 /
BENGTSSON, Daniel Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 14 /
HAKANSSON, Siwert Telia Research AB,Aurorum 6 S-977 75 Lulea / SE | 15 /
WEN, Ye Telia Research AB Aurorum 6, S-977 75 Lulea / SE | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | Akerman, Mårten Lennart Albihns.Zacco Studentgatan 4 Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Akerman, Marten Lennart Albihns Patentbyra Malmö AB P.O.Box 4289 203 14 Malmö 4 / SE | Application number, filing date | 97939276.8 | 01.09.1997 | [1999/24] | WO1997SE01452 | Priority number, date | SE19960003189 | 02.09.1996 Original published format: SE 9603189 | [1999/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9810547 | Date: | 12.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0922342 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0922342 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/06, H04L27/26 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
H04L27/2675 (EP,US);
H04L27/2656 (EP,US);
H04L27/2657 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/24] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN IN, ODER IN BEZUG AUF MEHRTRÄGERÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEME | [1999/24] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN, OR RELATING TO, MULTI-CARRIER TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS | [1999/24] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENTS RELATIFS A DES SYSTEMES DE TRANSMISSION A PORTEUSES MULTIPLES | [1999/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 06.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/24] | 15.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 14.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.01.2003 | BE | 29.01.2003 | CH | 29.01.2003 | FI | 29.01.2003 | GR | 29.01.2003 | IT | 29.01.2003 | LI | 29.01.2003 | NL | 29.01.2003 | DK | 29.04.2003 | PT | 29.04.2003 | SE | 29.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | IE | 01.09.2003 | LU | 01.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | [2008/08] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
BE | 29.01.2003 | ||
CH | 29.01.2003 | ||
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
BE | 29.01.2003 | ||
CH | 29.01.2003 | ||
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 01.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
BE | 29.01.2003 | ||
CH | 29.01.2003 | ||
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
LU | 01.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
BE | 29.01.2003 | ||
CH | 29.01.2003 | ||
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
CH | 29.01.2003 | ||
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
CH | 29.01.2003 | ||
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 29.01.2003 | |
CH | 29.01.2003 | ||
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | CH | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
PT | 29.04.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 29.01.2003 | |
FI | 29.01.2003 | ||
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 29.01.2003 | |
LI | 29.01.2003 | ||
SE | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 29.04.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5444697 (LEUNG CYBIL S [CA], et al); | [A]EP0689313 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO9602991 (AMATI COMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) |