EP1003930 - BRAIDED BASE FABRICS FOR SHOE PRESS BELTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. 1373 Broadway Albany, New York 12204 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states ALBANY INTERNATIONAL CORP. 1373 Broadway Albany, New York 12204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUTT, William, H. 9 Indian Pipe Drive Wynantskill, NY 12198 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Giver, Sören Bo, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Giver, Sören Bo, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 97939385.7 | 22.08.1997 | [2000/22] | WO1997US14146 | Priority number, date | US19960759040 | 03.12.1996 Original published format: US 759040 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9824968 | Date: | 11.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1003930 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003930 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.06.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
D21F3/0227 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S162/901 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | GEFLOCHTENES GRUNDGEWEBE FÜR EINES SCHUHPRESSBAND | [2000/22] | English: | BRAIDED BASE FABRICS FOR SHOE PRESS BELTS | [2000/22] | French: | TISSUS A BASE DE STRUCTURE TRESSEE DESTINES AUX COURROIES POUR PRESSES A PATINS | [2000/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 01.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1998 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 25.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US5196092 (STIGBERG CARL E [US]); | [Y]US5238537 (DUTT WILLIAM H [US]); | [A]US5242743 (NAKANISHI YASUYUKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5298124 (EKLUND NILS O [US], et al); | [Y]US5357839 (BROOKSTEIN DAVID S [US], et al); | [Y]US5501133 (BROOKSTEIN DAVID [US], et al) | by applicant | US19950401038 | US19950498199 |