EP1008029 - BATTERY INCORPORATED INTO COMPUTER CARRYING CASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVERCEL, Inc. 2 Lee Mac Avenue Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2000/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARKEY, Allen 61 Longmeadow Hill Road Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | 02 /
COATES, Dwaine, K. 110 Coalpit Hill B4 Danbury, CT 06813 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Gritschneder, Martin, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Gritschneder, Martin, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97939757.7 | 03.09.1997 | [2000/24] | WO1997US15458 | Priority number, date | US19960722605 | 27.09.1996 Original published format: US 722605 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9813743 | Date: | 02.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008029 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26, G06F1/16, H01M2/10 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
G06F1/1628 (EP,US);
H01M50/209 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] | Title | German: | BATTERIE INKORPORIERT IN EINE RECHNERTRAGEHÜLLE | [2000/24] | English: | BATTERY INCORPORATED INTO COMPUTER CARRYING CASE | [2000/24] | French: | BATTERIE INCORPOREE DANS UNE MALLETTE D'ORDINATEUR | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 29.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.03.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/42] | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4837590 (SPRAGUE GLENN R [US]) [A] 1* column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 25; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US5039928 (NISHI KAZUO [JP], et al); | [X]US5475626 (VILETTO GIACOMO [IT]); | [Y]US5553294 (NANNO NOBUYUKI [JP], et al); | [AP]US5563493 (MATSUDA KOUICHI [JP], et al); | [AP]US5630155 (KARAKI NOBUO [JP], et al) |