EP0865329 - MACHINE FOR REMOVING WRAP-AROUND LABELS OR SHRINK-WRAPS FROM BOTTLES OR SIMILAR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE | ||
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states KRONES AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT HERMANN KRONSEDER MASCHINENFABRIK Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93068 Neutraubling / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLARL, Heinrich Josef-Riedhammer-Strasse 3 D-93107 Thalmassing / DE | [1998/39] | Application number, filing date | 97940045.4 | 30.07.1997 | [1998/39] | WO1997EP04129 | Priority number, date | DE1996130690 | 30.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19630690 | DE1996141156 | 07.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19641156 | DE1996143403 | 21.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19643403 | [1998/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9804367 | Date: | 05.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0865329 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865329 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/08 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
B65C3/16 (EP,US);
B08B9/083 (EP,US);
B65C3/065 (EP,US);
B65C9/00 (EP,US);
B65C9/0015 (EP,US);
B65C9/2208 (EP,US);
B65D23/0842 (EP,US);
G09F3/04 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
B65C2009/0025 (EP,US);
B65C2009/0059 (EP,US);
B65D2203/02 (EP,US);
G09F2003/0273 (EP,US);
Y10S156/936 (EP,US);
Y10S83/924 (EP,US);
Y10S83/946 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1126 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1142 (EP,US);
Y10T156/19 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/39] | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUM ENTFERNEN VON RUNDUMETIKETTEN ODER SCHRUMPFHÜLSEN VON FLASCHEN ODER DGL. | [1998/39] | English: | MACHINE FOR REMOVING WRAP-AROUND LABELS OR SHRINK-WRAPS FROM BOTTLES OR SIMILAR DEVICES | [1998/39] | French: | MACHINE POUR RETIRER DE BOUTEILLES OU ANALOGUE DES ETIQUETTES CIRCULAIRES OU DES ENVELOPPES RETRACTABLES | [1998/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE4219051 (ALFILL GETRAENKETECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1,5,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,6,10-12; | [DA]WO9532814 (KRONSEDER MASCHF KRONES [DE], et al) [DA] 1-6,12 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - line 27 * * page 4, line 21 - page 8, line 16 * * page 10, line 27 - page 12, line 28; figure - *; | [X]EP0698424 (FUJI SEAL INC [JP]) [X] 1,5-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 2 * * column 12, line 51 - line 56 * * column 13, line 9 - line 19 * * column 13, line 45 - column 14, line 26; figure - *; | [A]DE19513221 (KRONSEDER HERMANN [DE]) [A] 13* figure - * |