EP0926984 - ANAESTHESIA CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF GLASGOW No. 2 The Square, University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | [2007/30] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY COURT OF THE UNIVERSITY OF GLASGOW No. 2 The Square, University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANTZARIDIS, Haralambos Flat 2/3, 18 Waverley Street, Shawlands Glasgow G41 2EA / GB | 02 /
KENNY, Gavin, Nicholson, Cleghorn 24 Springkell Avenue Pollokshields Glasgow G41 4EU / GB | [1999/37] |
Former [1999/27] | 01 /
MANTZARIDIS, Haralambos 58/2 Bonaly Rise Edinburgh EH13 0QX / GB | ||
02 /
KENNY, Gavin, Nicholson, Cleghorn 24 Springkell Avenue Pollokshields Glasgow G41 4EU / GB | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Gillam, Francis Cyril, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | ||
Former [2003/23] | Gray, John James, et al Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS / GB | ||
Former [1999/27] | Naismith, Robert Stewart, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 97940234.4 | 10.09.1997 | [1999/27] | WO1997GB02435 | Priority number, date | GB19960018998 | 11.09.1996 Original published format: GB 9618998 | [1999/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9810701 | Date: | 19.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0926984 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0926984 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/11 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
A61B5/4821 (EP,US);
A61B5/1106 (EP,US);
A61B2505/05 (EP,US);
A61B5/6814 (EP,US);
A61B5/7239 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, LI, PT, SE [1999/27] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ANÄSTHESIEÜBERWACHUNG | [1999/27] | English: | ANAESTHESIA CONTROL SYSTEM | [1999/27] | French: | SYSTEME DE REGULATION D'ANESTHESIE | [1999/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 13.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Request for further processing for: | 09.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.11.2007 | PT | 26.12.2007 | [2008/12] |
Former [2008/08] | ES | 05.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9119453 (STICHTING TECH WETENSCHAPP [NL]) [A] 1-5,8-10 * page 4, line 7 - page 6, line 26 *; | [A]WO9307804 (ASPECT MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-10* page 21, line 4 - page 36, line 18 *; | [X] - WEBB & AL, "Closed-loop control of depth of anaesthesia", MEASUREMENT AND CONTROL, UK, (199609), vol. 29, no. 7, XP000633029 [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 211 - page 215 * | by applicant | WO9307804 |