EP0871897 - CONTACTLESS DATA TRANSMISSION AND RECEIVING DEVICE WITH A SYNCHRONOUS DEMODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [1998/43] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PREISHUBER-PFLÜGL, Josef Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ARNOLD, Siegfried Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SPIESS, Bernhard Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
WATZINGER, Hubert Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1998/43] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/07] | Röggla, Harald, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/01] | Röggla, Harald, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Triester Strasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2006/10] | Röggla, Harald, et al Philips Austria GmbH Intellectual Property & Standards, Triester Strasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [1998/43] | Weber, Helmut Österreichische Philips Industrie GmbH Patent- und Warenzeichenabteilung Triesterstrasse 64 1101 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 97940280.7 | 26.09.1997 | [1998/43] | WO1997IB01160 | Priority number, date | EP19960890170 | 05.11.1996 Original published format: EP 96890170 | [1998/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9820363 | Date: | 14.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0871897 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/74 | [1998/43] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G01S13/74 (KR);
G01S13/758 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/43] | Title | German: | KONTAKTLOSE DATENÜBERTRAGUNG UND EMPFANGSGERÄT MIT SYNCHRONDEMODULATOR | [1998/43] | English: | CONTACTLESS DATA TRANSMISSION AND RECEIVING DEVICE WITH A SYNCHRONOUS DEMODULATOR | [1998/43] | French: | TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES SANS CONTACT ET DISPOSITIF DE RECEPTION MUNI D'UN DETECTEUR SYNCHRONE | [1998/43] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 21.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0710756 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0625832 (STOBBE ANATOLI [DE]); | [AP]EP0745747 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) |