EP0862056 - GAS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Riken 13-5, Kudan-Kita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | [2006/08] |
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Riken 13-5, Kudan-Kita 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 102-0073 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Yunzhi Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360-8522 / JP | 02 /
KUNIMOTO, Akira Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360-8522 / JP | 03 /
YAN, Yongtie Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360-8522 / JP | 04 /
KUROSAWA, Hideyuki Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360-8522 / JP | 05 /
NAKANOUCHI, Yukio Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360-8522 / JP | 06 /
MIURA, Norio Room 301 Jyonan Heights 17-5, Hirao 3-chome Chuo-ku Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka-ken 810-0014 / JP | 07 /
YAMAZOE, Noboru 32, Matsugaoka 4-chome Kasuga-shi Fukuoka-ken 816-0843 / JP | 08 /
HASEI, Masaharu Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360-8522 / JP | [2006/06] |
Former [1998/36] | 01 /
GAO, Yunzhi Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360 / JP | ||
02 /
KUNIMOTO, Akira Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360 / JP | |||
03 /
YAN, Yongtie Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360 / JP | |||
04 /
KUROSAWA, Hideyuki Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360 / JP | |||
05 /
NAKANOUCHI, Yukio Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360 / JP | |||
06 /
MIURA, Norio Room 301 Jyonan Heights 17-5, Hirao 3-chome Chuo-ku, Fukuoka-shi Fukuoka-ken 810 / JP | |||
07 /
YAMAZOE, Noboru 32, Matsugaoka 4-chome Kasuga-shi Fukuoka-ken 816 / JP | |||
08 /
HASEI, Masaharu Kabushiki Kaisha Riken Kumagaya Office 14-1, Suehiro 4-chome Kumagaya-shi Saitama-ken 360 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1998/36] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 97940392.0 | 16.09.1997 | [1998/36] | WO1997JP03262 | Priority number, date | JP19960265061 | 17.09.1996 Original published format: JP 26506196 | [1998/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812550 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0862056 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862056 | Date: | 22.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/416, G01N27/409, G01N33/00 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
G01N27/419 (EP,US);
G01N27/4065 (EP,US);
G01N27/417 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/36] | G01N27/416, G01N27/409 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1998/36] | Title | German: | GAS SENSOR | [1998/36] | English: | GAS SENSOR | [1998/36] | French: | CAPTEUR DE GAZ | [1998/36] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1998 | Translation filed | 15.05.1998 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1998 | Search fee paid | 15.05.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 23.06.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0829387 ; | [A]EP0306983 (JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYST [JP]) [A] 1-30 * figure 10 *; | [A]US4927517 (MIZUTANI YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * figure 7 *; | [Y]US5080775 (YAMAUCHI SHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-30 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 15 *; | [A]WO9425642 (CERAMATEC INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * figures 5,7,8 *; | [Y]WO9514226 (CERAMATEC INC [US]) [Y] 1-30 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0678740 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-30 * figure 17 *; | [A]US5466350 (BAKER CHARLES K [US], et al) [A] 1-30* figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0731351 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-30 * figure 0 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 096, no. 006, & JP08029387 A 19960202 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS6338154 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [X]JPH046459 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH05288710 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD); | [Y]JPH07209249 (RIKEN KK); | [Y]JPH07234203 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD, et al) |