EP0928105 - INTERNET TELEVISION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACCESS CO., LTD. 7th Floor, Jinbo-kyowa Bldg., 1-64, Kandajinbo-cho Tokyo 101 / JP | [1999/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMADA, Tomihisa Access Co., Ltd. 64, Kanda Jinbo-cho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1999/27] | Application number, filing date | 97940399.5 | 17.09.1997 | [1999/27] | WO1997JP03273 | Priority number, date | JP19960246528 | 18.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24652896 | [1999/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9812871 | Date: | 26.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0928105 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928105 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44, G06F3/14, G06F3/033, G06F15/00 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/14 (KR);
G06F16/957 (EP,US);
H01L21/76202 (EP,US);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4782 (EP,US);
G09G5/36 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/27] | Title | German: | INTERNET-FERNSEHGERÄT | [1999/27] | English: | INTERNET TELEVISION APPARATUS | [1999/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE TELEVISION INTERNET | [1999/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1998 | Translation filed | 09.04.1999 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1999 | Search fee paid | 09.04.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 10.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00107778.3 / EP1026888 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0723369 (NTEX DATACOMMUNICATIONS BV [NL]) | [A] - "VERKNUEPFUNG VON TV MIT INTERNET", FUNKSCHAU, (19960816), vol. 68, no. 18, ISSN 0016-2841, page 70/71, XP000631189 [A] 1,2,6,7 * page 71, column M, line 9 - line 22 * | [A] - DAVISON A, "CLICKABLE IMAGES IN HTML", DR. DOBBS JOURNAL, (19950901), vol. 20, no. 9, pages 18 - 20, 22, 24,, XP000562505 [A] 1,2,6,7 | International search | [P]JPH09205497 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [P]JPH09163348 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [P]JPH09162818 (SONY CORP); | [P]JPH0991189 (CANON KK); | [P]JPH0991188 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH07193756 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH06289996 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH05189152 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPH05181584 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH0556405 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) |