Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002508890 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 | US9715370 | 28.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU722239B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2000 | B2 | AU4244097 | 19.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 | US9715370 | 28.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1002435 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 | US9715370 | 28.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9712973 | 06.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 | US9715370 | 28.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2266461 | 05.03.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 | US9715370 | 28.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO990958L | 27.04.1999 | L | NO990958D0 | 26.02.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 | US9715370 | 28.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9809463 | Global Dossier | 14.05.1998 | A3 | WO9809463 | 05.03.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100499759B | 07.07.2005 | B1 | KR20000035926 | 26.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5966652 | 12.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US70546796 | 29.08.1996 |